REFUGEE ACTION

Charity number: 283660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elaheh Akbari Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
Amaf Yousef Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
ROSALIND LUCAS Trustee 07 December 2017 None on record
Thomas Skrinar Trustee 07 December 2017 None on record
Catherine Lebadou Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
Serge Eric Yamou Trustee 11 January 2019 None on record
Irmani Smallwood Trustee 16 July 2015 None on record
Joseph Jenkins Trustee 16 July 2015 None on record
Mary Njoroge Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
Penny Lawrence Chair 22 January 2020 None on record
Emmanuel Serrano Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
CHRISTOPHER WALTER RANDALL Trustee None on record