KENSINGTON PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 283674
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 August 2021 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 30 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required