KENSINGTON PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 283674
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £16.40k £16.28k £15.30k £15.49k £13.22k
Total expenditure £17.08k £16.49k £15.45k £15.85k £10.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A