Dogfen lywodraethu LA LECHE LEAGUE GREAT BRITAIN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/2014 as amended on 20 May 2020 as amended on 06 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND PSYCOLOGICAL HEALTH OF MOTHERS AND CHILDREN THROUGH EDUCATION IN THE TECHNIQUE OF BREASTFEEDING, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND ESPECIALLY THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE CARE OF CHILDREN IN THE HEALTH BENEFITS BOTH IMMEDIATE AND LONG-TERM OF BREASTFEEDING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.