Trustees THE LONDON WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 283895
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Stephen Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Rachel Starling Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Anthony Richardson Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Hannah Fox Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Kapila Perera Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Amy Mount Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Dr STEPHEN PAUL SNAITH Trustee 29 September 2018
None on record
Rufus Radcliffe Trustee 23 September 2017
None on record
Dr Melissa Glackin Trustee 23 September 2017
None on record
John Crompton Tweddle Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record