Trustees CASSIO PRODUCTIONS
Charity number: 283911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Ann Kathleen Noble | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMILY MAY SISSONS | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Kirsty Elizabeth Rogers | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam Christie | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Kenny | Trustee | 11 June 2018 |
|
|||||
REBECCA ESPINOZA | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deidre Elizabeth Keyte | Trustee | 11 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY LAWSON | Trustee | 19 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ANNE GILLAM | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.