Trustees THE BRITISH INSTITUTE OF ORGAN STUDIES
Charity number: 283936
Charity reporting is up to date (147 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan John Thurlow | Chair | 01 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||
Nicholas Thistlethwaite | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Martin Tindall BMus | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jeffrey Ross Williams BA FTCL | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Paul Gray MMus BA | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||
DAVID MARTIN SHEPHERD LRAM ARCM | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JEFFREY KEITH WEST BA PhD FSA | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
GORDON DOUGLAS WILLIAM CURTIS MA | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr David Ernest George Shuker BSc MA PhD | Trustee | 05 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JOHN ROWNTREE PHD ARCM | Trustee | 17 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD HOBSON MA OXON | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||
MARK VENNING MA FRCO | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
COLIN DOUGLAS LIVINGSTONE MENZIES OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
ADRIAN CHARLES MUMFORD MAMMusFCIS | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
MELVIN HUGHES MA ARCO | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
DR KATHARINE FRANCES PARDEE DMA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.