WESTON-SUPER-MARE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF THE ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND LODGE OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 284043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required