PETERBOROUGH CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
- 17 May 2000: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 May 2000: Funds transferred to 1070001 PETERBOROUGH CROSSROADS LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD NOVEMBER 1981 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUNE 1995 AND 10 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF CARERS OF PEOPLE WITH A PHYSICAL DISABLITY AND OR LEARNING DISABILITY AND PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY AND MENTALLY INFIRM, IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE AREA KNOWN AS THE PETERBOROUGH SOCIAL SERVICES DIVISION AS DEFINED IN 1992. (HEREAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT)
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.