NORTH WEALD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is hired out to local people & organisations covering all ages, from a pre school group to the senior citizens club.We have many groups using our hall . We are also the chosen venue for local organisations such as the British Legion and Parish Council to hold their annual functions. The total income & expenditure covers hall & bar.Bar accounts are separated within our accounts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 14 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Curry | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhoda Philpot | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clements | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nina Roby | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE BEES | Trustee | 08 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE CLEMENTS | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Gould | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET MULLINER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.89k | £24.74k | £19.97k | £38.06k | £31.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.85k | £26.25k | £21.32k | £39.87k | £35.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.14k | N/A | £5.99k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 January 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02/05/1966 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH WEALD BASSETT AND NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTH WEALD BASSETT AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
166 High Road
North Weald
EPPING
Essex
CM16 6BZ
- Phone:
- 01992523535
- Email:
- nweald.villagehall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window