Financial history FRIENDS OF DONHEAD

Charity number: 284059
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £58.57k £94.42k £67.10k £64.23k £27.79k
Total expenditure £25.92k £45.65k £42.60k £58.49k £22.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A