STEVENAGEN CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 284221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £16.76k £13.22k £13.60k £13.15k £12.42k
Total expenditure £18.10k £14.74k £17.42k £16.36k £6.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A