ST BURYAN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 284235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 12 April 2021 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 18 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required