ST BURYAN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 284235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £4.84k £4.75k £4.44k £4.94k £13.33k
Total expenditure £2.73k £2.90k £3.14k £4.68k £3.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k