FRIENDS OF ASHBURTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to assist with covering costs of school trips and other resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
Governance
- 03 March 1982: Standard registration
- ASHBURTON PRIMARY HOME-SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF ASHBURTON PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Florian Bailhache | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Walker | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Axford | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.41k | £4.14k | £30.37k | £6.63k | £9.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £20.02k | £20.81k | £10.32k | £13.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 488 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 488 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2023 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST OCTOBER 1981, AS AMENDED ON 23RD OCTOBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVICIONS OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT USUALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANICLLLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT MAY ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashburton Primary School
Whistley Hill
Ashburton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 7DW
- Phone:
- 01364652343
- Email:
- ashbpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window