RESTORATION TRUST FOR THE CHURCH OF ST MARY'S OF REDENHALL WITH HARLESTON AND WORTWELL

Charity number: 284276
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £16.05k £7.65k £3.44k £2.82k £3.73k
Total expenditure £9.02k £4.55k £13.65k £3.61k £637
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A