Financial history PSYCHIATRY RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 284286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £413.99k £559.89k £278.49k £205.87k £616.00k
Total expenditure £199.18k £419.69k £444.24k £483.74k £320.73k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £489.19k N/A N/A £574.68k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £5.63k N/A N/A £1.36k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £65.07k N/A N/A £39.95k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A £155.14k N/A N/A £521.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £407.49k N/A N/A £309.08k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £12.20k N/A N/A £11.65k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £40.93k N/A N/A £86.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £222.48k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £11.65k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0