Trustees PSYCHIATRY RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 284286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Tom Craig Chair 18 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PURLEY, ST. MARK (WOODCOTE)
Received: On time
Professor Khalida Ismail Trustee 30 May 2019
None on record
Professor Carmine Pariante Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Professor George Szmukler Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Professor Paola Dazzan Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Professor Elizabeth Kuipers Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
Professor Janet Treasure OBE Trustee 19 November 2014
None on record
Ben Williams Trustee 13 November 2014
None on record
MICHAEL STEWART Trustee 14 December 2011
None on record
Professor STEPHEN SCOTT Trustee
PLACE2BE
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILD AND ADOLESCENT MENTAL HEALTH
Received: On time
Professor DINESH BHUGRA Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR EMERITUS PETER LANTOS Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR SIR DAVID GOLDBERG Trustee
None on record