Financial history THE MUSIC LIBRARIES TRUST

Charity number: 284334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.80k £1.61k £681 £1.80k £723
Total expenditure £1.49k £1.26k £2.23k £3.85k £2.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A