Financial history CONCERN FOR LIFE

Charity number: 284383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.24k £3.08k £4.92k £3.09k £3.24k
Total expenditure £764 £2.68k £7.38k £2.86k £35
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A