Accounts and annual returns THE BRITAIN-BURMA BUDDHIST TRUST

Charity number: 284619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 March 2021 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 March 2021 637 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 28 July 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 July 2017 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required