SUDBURY NEWSTALK

Charity number: 284646
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 20 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)