SAINT CATHERINE'S HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 284701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.90m £5.52m £5.47m £5.66m £5.65m
Total expenditure £6.13m £6.20m £6.07m £5.88m £6.03m
Income from government contracts £1.94m £1.96m £1.93m £2.02m £2.11m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £47.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01m £1.77m £1.73m £1.70m £1.67m
Income - Other trading activities £1.76m £1.60m £1.65m £1.82m £1.70m
Income - Charitable activities £2.01m £2.02m £1.99m £2.04m £2.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.07k £122.59k £104.10k £104.80k £105.90k
Income - Other £0 £3.54k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.33m £1.06m £1.08m £1.03m £981.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.62m £4.75m £4.60m £4.33m £4.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.51m £1.45m £1.47m £1.55m £1.59m
Expenditure - Governance £29.04k £27.83k £30.73k £28.92k £30.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £19.33k £19.90k £20.23k £20.50k £20.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.94k £0 £0