SAINT CATHERINE'S HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 284701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Holbrook Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Susan Carole Standard-Sheader Trustee 03 October 2016 None on record
John Cyril Stevenson Trustee 24 August 2015 None on record
MALCOLM CHELL Trustee 12 July 2013 None on record
MARGARET MIDDLEBROOK Chair 20 November 2012 None on record
Dr Dougy Moederle-Lumb Trustee 02 November 2020 None on record
Suzanne Burnett Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
Debbie Westmoreland Trustee 07 October 2019 None on record
SIMON PETER WARD Trustee
SCARBOROUGH FLOWER FUND HOMES Received: On time