Accounts and annual returns SOUTHEND FESTIVAL CHORUS

Charity number: 284725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 06 October 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 01 October 2019 123 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required