Financial history SOUTHEND FESTIVAL CHORUS

Charity number: 284725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £25.30k £21.97k £16.75k £12.44k £11.56k
Total expenditure £24.19k £25.96k £17.71k £12.05k £10.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A