Financial history CITY OF LONDON FREEMEN'S SCHOOL BURSARY FUND

Charity number: 284769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £46.91k £38.68k £86.11k £295.12k £269.07k
Total expenditure £12.36k £23.13k £32.03k £42.20k £36.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A