Accounts and annual returns THE MELTON OLD CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 284787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2021 13 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2017 Not Required