Financial history THE MELTON OLD CHURCH SOCIETY

Charity number: 284787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/09/2017 29/09/2018 29/09/2019 29/09/2020 29/09/2021
Total gross income £17.23k £5.23k £5.07k £3.77k £6.45k
Total expenditure £5.44k £14.40k £3.97k £4.92k £4.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A