Financial history THE TYNDALE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 284840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £10.34k £14.27k £7.78k £5.51k £12.67k
Total expenditure £14.51k £29.97k £26.82k £13.02k £13.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A