Trustees THE TYNDALE CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 284840

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Magnus Carter | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Mary White | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Barnes | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Culverwell | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HICKS | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR MACLEOD | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Rymer | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Liz Swanwick | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION MILLER | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BENNETT | Trustee | 24 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.