THE INSTITUTE OF FAMILY THERAPY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) The objects are for the advancement of the science and skill of family therapy and systemic practice. b) For the purposes of clause 3 (a) the term 'systemic practice' science. means an approach based on how wider systems, such as the family and the community, affect personal relationships and the behaviour of the individual; and ii. includes the resolution of the relationship disputes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income:
£944,690
Donations and legacies | £15.64k | |
Charitable activities | £925.30k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.15k | |
Other | £2.61k |
Total expenditure:
£1,029,689
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £235,532 from 15 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Income generation and governance | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.03m |
People
11 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 1982: Standard registration
- IFT (Working name)
- THE INSTITUTE OF FAMILY THERAPY (LONDON) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN WATERS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Philip Messent | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ankur Gupta | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dick | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR PEARSON | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.14m | £998.10k | £998.10k | £669.60k | £944.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11m | £1.05m | £1.04m | £871.32k | £1.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £663.67k | £441.11k | £393.97k | £168.18k | £235.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.84k | £5.33k | £17.04k | £5.11k | £15.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £944.24k | £918.30k | £662.80k | £925.30k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.29k | £2.52k | £3.00k | £869 | £1.15k | |
|
Income - Other | £62.36k | £46.01k | £2.77k | £820 | £2.61k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £1.05m | £1.04m | £851.10k | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.30k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £65.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20.22k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £60.22k | £5.96k | £171.53k | £143.82k | £128.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.41m | £1.48m | £948.02k | £754.35k | £896.13k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£56.15k | £0 | -£40.05k | -£27.55k | -£4.86k | |
|
Total liabilities | £435.50k | £553.33k | £243.49k | £236.33k | £459.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 02 September 2019 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | 02 September 2019 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED 9/6/83, 8/12/1983, 6/12/84, 8/12/88, 11/3/93, 2/12/93, 8/12/94 AND 24/3/97 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 29TH JANUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE AND SKILL OF FAMILY THERAPY AND ESPECIALLY THE TEACHING THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-4 Great Tower Street
London
EC3R 5AA
- Phone:
- 02073919150
- Email:
- info@ift.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window