KIDSACTIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dormant subsidiary
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 July 1982: Standard registration
- H A P A LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE HANDICAPPED ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIDS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH MAY 1982, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29TH SEPTEMBER 1993, 25 SEPTEMBER 1996, 6TH NOVEMBER 2001 AND 7TH JULY 2003.
Charitable objects
TO MAKE PROMOTE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PLAY THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN (AND YOUNG PEOPLE) WITH PHYSICAL AND LEARNING DISABILITIES AND EMOTIONAL DIFFICULTIES AND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ESPECIALLY DESIGNED AND ORGANISED FACILITIES WHICH ENCOURAGE THEM TO PLAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KIDS
7-9 Elliotts Place
LONDON
N1 8HX
- Phone:
- 0207 359 3635
- Email:
- enquiries@kids.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window