Accounts and annual returns MASSEY SHAW AND MARINE VESSELS PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 284970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required