Financial history MASSEY SHAW AND MARINE VESSELS PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 284970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.37k £101.38k £8.82k £9.90k £6.49k
Total expenditure £14.82k £97.05k £6.36k £6.62k £8.01k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A