Financial history WINCHESTER DRAMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 285043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £96.27k £95.89k £75.57k £36.81k £122.26k
Total expenditure £71.53k £70.74k £56.21k £20.39k £36.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £13.21k