Trustees WINCHESTER DRAMATIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 285043

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Jane Danby | Chair | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terrance Gregory Lohr | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Natalie Jacobs | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Mervyn Liddiard | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexander Demetrius Walters | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Tracey Ashwell | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ROGER JAMES | Trustee | 19 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER HUMPHREY | Trustee | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SMALL | Trustee | 23 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER GLYN BATESON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.