THE FAN CIRCLE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fan Circle International brings together collectors and enthusiasts from around the world. We encourage members to undertake research into fans and fan makers which is then published in our bulletin. We also give grants towards conservation of fans in museum collections and sponsorship towards fan making competitions in conjunction with local mueums.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Canada
- France
- Germany
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Poland
- Portugal
- Scotland
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 28 July 1982: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 March 2009: Standard registration
- F C I (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HELEN MARR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN Heatley | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN MILLIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.09k | £26.39k | £7.13k | £10.58k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.53k | £26.53k | £7.60k | £10.99k | £11.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH MAY 1982
Charitable objects
1) TO BENEFIT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE STUDY AND COLLECTION OF FANS OF ALL PERIODS AND FROM ALL COUNTRIES.2) TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN RESEARCH INTO THEIR HISTORY AND MANUFACTURE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUC RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 GUINEA CLOSE
BRAINTREE
CM7 9DP
- Phone:
- 01376347659
- Email:
- helen.marr@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
fancircleinternational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window