BANGLADESH ISLAMIC CENTRE ST ALBANS

Charity number: 285054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download