Financial history THE PROVINCE OF THE INDIAN OCEAN SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 285061
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.52k £1.91k £5.39k £5.33k £2.82k
Total expenditure £2.77k £10.80k £82 £4.73k £4.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A