Financial history THE ROYAL ALBERT HALL TRUST

Charity number: 285111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.88m £2.83m £2.02m £3.61m £4.85m
Total expenditure £2.67m £4.13m £2.22m £3.95m £3.48m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.86m £2.64m £1.71m £3.25m £4.83m
Income - Other trading activities £20.00k £187.00k £300.00k £347.00k £19.00k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £14.00k £11.00k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £248.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.67m £4.13m £2.22m £3.95m £3.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.00k £1.00k £1.00k £4.00k £1.00k
Expenditure - Governance £1.00k £0 £2.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0