THE BEDDINGTON AND WALLINGTON SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity number: 285112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Social club for the elderly

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £4,308
Total expenditure: £5,486

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sutton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Beryl Smith Chair 29 December 2017
None on record
BEVERLEY BROYD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.20k £1.79k £3.53k £4.57k £4.31k
Total expenditure £2.51k £2.57k £5.93k £5.63k £5.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 HILLIERS LANE
CROYDON
CR0 4SU
Phone:
02086860916
Website:

No information available