Financial history SOUTHEND SENIOR PHAB CLUB

Charity number: 285118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.66k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £6.81k £1.20k £2.53k £0 £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A