THE INSTITUTE FOR POLICY RESEARCH

Charity number: 285143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 09 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 13 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 13 March 2017 On time Download