THE INSTITUTE FOR POLICY RESEARCH

Charity number: 285143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £682.50k £507.80k £637.38k £391.65k £317.49k
Total expenditure £792.47k £594.32k £425.81k £480.36k £264.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £680.67k £507.00k £636.32k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £1.83k £803 £1.06k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £792.47k £594.32k £425.81k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.55k £16.22k £21.46k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £780.93k £578.10k £404.35k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A