THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, LONG CRENDON

Charity number: 285163
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 January 2021 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)