Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, LONG CRENDON
Charity number: 285163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowland Arthur Willis | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Calvin Frost | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Maralyn Ann Harris | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Catriona Cameron Muir | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Peters | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Helen Jane Auster | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Swinney | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Alysson Viner | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Darryl Mansfield | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Richard Matthew Phillips | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||
CATHERINE BULLOCK | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN HOOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.