DORIC LODGE NO 1193 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 285168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Collect monies and distribute to poor and distressed individuals and for other Charitable purposes,as defined in the Trust deed dated 19th May 1982.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,039
Total expenditure: £3,989

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Martin Pettigrew Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Ian Poyser Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
Roger Peter Bayes Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record
RODERICK NIGEL LARWOOD Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.83k £1.64k £1.26k £6.74k £3.04k
Total expenditure £3.40k £1.05k £1.25k £3.26k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE OAKS
LARLING
NR16 2QS
Phone:
01953717937
Website:

No information available