WESTMINSTER TREE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The greening of Westminster by planting trees in the streets, open spaces, schools and housing estates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 13 August 1982: Standard registration
- WESTMINSTER TREE TRUST (Working name)
- THE WESTMINSTER TREE PRESERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- WESTMINSTER TREE AND PRESERVATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JULIAN RUBACK CBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Phillip Clark | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Milne Wallington Glen | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Cllr Heather Jane Acton | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA EYRE | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MELODY ODUSANYA | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELIZABETH BUSH | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|||||
JULIA YVONNE LONSDALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LADY SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK NICHOLAS CAMERON GAZALEH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.46k | £988 | £1.33k | £4.17k | £403 | |
|
Total expenditure | £996 | £15.00k | £0 | £1.37k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 November 2021 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/05/1982 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON BOROUGHS THE PRESERVATION OF THE NATURAL AMENITIES OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD AND GENERALLY TO PROTECT PRESERVE AND CULTIVATE THE CHARACTER AND SURROUNDS OF THE SAID LONDON BOROUGHS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PURPOSE OF PLANTING TREES AND FLORA OR EFFECTING ARRANGEMENTS FOR PLANTING THE SAME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 WEST WARWICK PLACE
LONDON
SW1V 2DH
- Phone:
- 02078218671
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window