Trustees NORTH LONDON HOSPICE
Charity number: 285300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELISABETH BURGESS JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Ujjal SARKAR | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mohini PARMAR | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Saurabh KHARE | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna BOKOBZA | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Harris | Trustee | 23 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Woodwark | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Walters | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Males | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry Thomas Fairfax Easterling | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jane Taylor | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN REID | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL MIRIAM HOLMES | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR JUDITH ANN TOBIN | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIMON MORRIS | Trustee | 28 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.